CA AB237 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 8.5 (commencing with Section 54930) to Part 1 of Division 2 of Title 5 of the Government Code, relating to local governments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local governments: parcel taxes: notice.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Education (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-02-01AssemblyFrom committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2016-01-31AssemblyDied pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
2015-05-28AssemblyIn committee: Held under submission.
2015-05-20AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2015-05-04AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2015-04-21AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on ED.
2015-04-20AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2015-04-16AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 15).
2015-04-07AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2015-04-06AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
2015-02-17AssemblyReferred to Com. on L. GOV.
2015-02-06AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 8.
2015-02-05AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code54930New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback