CA AB237 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - Died on inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act relating to state employees, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State employees: memorandum of understanding.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-02-03AssemblyDied on inactive file.
2013-09-11AssemblyOrdered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Atkins.
2013-05-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 24). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-05-08AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2013-04-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-02-15AssemblyReferred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S.
2013-02-06AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 8.
2013-02-05AssemblyRead first time. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback