CA AB237 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-01 - Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 111821 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to cosmetics.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cosmetics: safety.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-02-01 Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2011-05-27 In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
2011-05-18 In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2011-05-11 Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2011-05-10 Read second time and amended.
2011-05-09 From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (May 3).
2011-04-26 In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2011-03-22 In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2011-02-18 Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2011-02-04 From printer. May be heard in committee March 6.
2011-02-03 Read first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code111821New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback