CA AB2368 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-26 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 1181.1 to the Civil Code, and to add the heading of Article 1 (commencing with Section 8200) to, and to add Article 2 (commencing with Section 8231) to, Chapter 3 of Division 1 of Title 2 of, the Government Code, relating to notaries public.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Online Notary Act of 2018.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - Assembly - AB 2368 CALDERON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-26SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-06-13SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2018-06-04SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5649.)
2018-05-29AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2018-05-25AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 25).
2018-05-16AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-04-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-23AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2018-04-19AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
2018-04-02AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2018-03-23AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-22AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2018-02-15AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
2018-02-14AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Civil Code1181.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code8200Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback