CA AB2366 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 11369 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to controlled substances.
Title
Controlled substances.
Sponsors
Asm. Jim Patterson [R] | Sen. Melissa Melendez [R] | Asm. Laurie Davies [R] | Asm. Tom Lackey [R] |
Sen. Kelly Seyarto [R] | Sen. Scott Wilk [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-03-22 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-03-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2022-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 11369 | New Code | See Bill Text |