CA AB2366 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Article 1.5 (commencing with Section 49420) of Chapter 9 of Part 27 of Division 4 of Title 2 of the Education Code, relating to pupil health.
Title
Pupil health: Trauma, Grief, and Loss Pilot Program.
Sponsors
Asm. Kansen Chu [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2020-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2020-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 49420 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2366 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2366 |