CA AB2361 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Article 6 (commencing with Section 92060) to Chapter 1 of Part 57 of Division 9 of Title 3 of the Education Code, relating to postsecondary education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

University of California: outsource contracts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2361 Weber et al. By Lara (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - AB 2361 WEBER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Accountability and Administrative Review] (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-30 Vetoed by Governor.
2018-08-30AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
2018-08-24AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-08-24SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 5698.).
2018-08-17SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-17SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 16).
2018-08-06SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-06-28SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-13SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2018-06-04SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 22. Page 5592.)
2018-05-25AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 25).
2018-05-25AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2018-05-16AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-05-02AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-01AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2018-04-30AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 25).
2018-04-23AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
2018-04-19AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended.
2018-04-18AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. (Ayes 9. Noes 4.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
2018-04-10AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2018-04-09AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
2018-04-03AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2018-03-01AssemblyReferred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and A. & A.R.
2018-02-14AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
2018-02-13AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code92060New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback