CA AB236 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - Died on inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - Died on inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 84109 to the Government Code, relating to the Political Reform Act of 1974.
Title
Campaign disclosure: limited liability companies.
Sponsors
Asm. Marc Berman [D] | Asm. Steve Bennett [D] | Asm. Ash Kalra [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Assembly | Died on inactive file. |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Berman. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1464.) |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-04-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (April 28). |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2021-03-11 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ELECTIONS. |
2021-03-10 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ELECTIONS. Read second time and amended. |
2021-01-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ELECTIONS. |
2021-01-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 13. |
2021-01-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 84109 | New Code | See Bill Text |