CA AB2357 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-15 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Governance and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-15 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Governance and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 54221, 54222, 54222.5, 54223, 54224, 54225, 54227, and 54230.5 of, and to add Section 54221.5 to, the Government Code, relating to local government.
Title
Surplus land.
Sponsors
Asm. Philip Ting [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2357 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing and Community Development] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing and Community Development] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-15 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and HOUSING. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 19. Page 4932.) |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 19). |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2022-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2022-04-05 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-03 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and H. & C.D. |
2022-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2022-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 54221 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 54221.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 54222 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 54222.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 54223 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 54224 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 54225 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 54227 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 54230.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |