CA AB2357 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1841 of the Water Code, relating to water.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Water rights: monitoring and reporting.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-31 - Assembly - AB 2357 DAHLE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-11-30SenateFrom Senate committee without further action.
2016-06-27SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2016-06-09SenateReferred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2016-06-01SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2016-05-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5035.)
2016-05-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2016-04-27AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2016-04-13AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2016-04-06AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
2016-04-05AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. Read second time and amended.
2016-03-28AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
2016-03-17AssemblyReferred to Com. on W., P., & W. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. Read second time and amended.
2016-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
2016-02-18AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Water Code1840Amended CodeCitation Text
Water Code1841Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback