CA AB2355 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 25 Assembly Appropriations Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 26003 and 26011.8 of the Public Resources Code, and to amend Sections 6377.1, 17052.12, 17053.73, 17059.2, 23609, 23626, and 23689 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sales and use taxes: exclusions: exemptions: income taxes: credits: border wall.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-16AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-05-08AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (May 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-02AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2018-03-22AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-22AssemblyReferred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2018-02-14AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
2018-02-13AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback