CA AB2351 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-16 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Revenue and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-16 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Revenue and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 4.5 (commencing with Section 69575) to Chapter 2 of Part 42 of Division 5 of Title 3 of the Education Code, and to add Sections 17043.5 and 19602.6 to the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to public education, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Higher Education Assistance Fund: personal income taxes: additional tax.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-16 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-03-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2018-03-19 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-15 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on REV. & TAX. and HIGHER ED. |
2018-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2018-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 69575 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 99000 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17043.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 19602.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB2351 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB2351 |