CA AB235 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-02 - Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and Water Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-02 - Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and Water Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 2074.2, 2074.6, and 2084 of the Fish and Game Code, relating to endangered species, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Endangered species: candidate species: petitions: takings.
Sponsors
Asm. Chad Mayes [I] | Asm. Tom Lackey [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - Assembly - AB 235 Mayes Assembly Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 2 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-02 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2020-06-29 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2019-09-06 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2019-06-27 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 2. Page 1790.) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 16). |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 24). |
2019-02-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2019-01-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 21. |
2019-01-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Fish and Game Code | 2074.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Fish and Game Code | 2074.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Fish and Game Code | 2084 | Amended Code | Citation Text |