CA AB235 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 423, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1317.1 of, and to add Section 1317.4a to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to emergency services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Emergency services and care.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2009-08-31 - Assembly - AB 235 HAYASHI Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2009-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB235 Hayashi By Correa (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-06-29 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-06-17 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-05-11 - Assembly - AB 235 HAYASHI Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2009-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-03-31 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2009-10-11 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 423, Statutes of 2009.
2009-10-11 Approved by the Governor.
2009-09-04 Enrolled and to the Governor at 2 p.m.
2009-08-31 Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2805.)
2009-08-27 In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2009-08-27 Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 3. Page 1962.)
2009-07-01 Read second time. To third reading.
2009-06-30 From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (June 29).
2009-06-18 From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (June 17).
2009-06-11 From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2009-05-21 Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2009-05-11 In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2009-05-11 Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1364.)
2009-05-04 Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
2009-04-30 From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 29).
2009-04-15 Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2009-04-14 Read second time and amended.
2009-04-13 From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (March 31).
2009-03-24 In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2009-03-04 Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2009-02-07 From printer. May be heard in committee March 9.
2009-02-06 Read first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code1317.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1317.4New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_235&sess=0910&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_235_bill_20090206_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_235_bill_20090414_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_235_bill_20090611_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_235_bill_20090902_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_235_bill_20091011_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_235_vote_20090331_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_235_vote_20090429_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_235_vote_20090511_0230PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_235_vote_20090617_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_235_vote_20090629_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_235_vote_20090827_0925AM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_235_vote_20090831_1216PM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback