CA AB2348 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-05 - Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-05 - Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1385.004 of, and to add Section 1385.008 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to health care service plans.
Title
Pharmacy benefit management.
Sponsors
Asm. Jim Wood [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2020-05-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2020-04-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2020-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2020-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1385.004 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1385.008 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2348 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2348 |