CA AB2345 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-06 - Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 2827.2 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to renewable energy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Renewable energy: shared renewable energy tariffs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-16 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - AB 2345 REYES Assembly Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-06SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-08-06SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2018-08-06SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-08-06SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-20SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2018-05-16SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-25SenateReferred to Com. on EQ.
2018-04-12SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-04-12AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 4638.)
2018-04-09AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-04-09AssemblyFrom Consent Calendar.
2018-04-05AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-04-04AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 4).
2018-03-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-03-01AssemblyReferred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
2018-02-14AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
2018-02-13AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code25200Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code25200.25New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code2827.2New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback