CA AB2345 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-25 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-25 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Part 6 (commencing with Section 4801) to Division 3 of the Food and Agricultural Code, relating to fairs.
Title
Fairs: sustainability.
Sponsors
Asm. Fiona Ma [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-25 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |
2012-05-16 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-04-25 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-04-09 | Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. | |
2012-03-29 | Referred to Com. on AGRI. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-02-27 | Read first time. | |
2012-02-26 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |
2012-02-24 | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Food and Agricultural Code | 4801 | New Code | See Bill Text |