CA AB2341 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 2937 and 4019.7 to the Penal Code, relating to criminal procedure.
Title
Criminal procedure: sentencing credits.
Sponsors
Asm. Vince Fong [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-14 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-02-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2024-02-13 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 14. |
2024-02-12 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 2937 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 4019.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |