CA AB234 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-03 - Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
Pending: Assembly Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-03 - Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
Pending: Assembly Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 5.8 (commencing with Section 42359) to Part 3 of Division 30 of the Public Resources Code, relating to solid waste.
Title
Microparticles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2023-03-30 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2023-03-23 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-23 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and E.S. & T.M. |
2023-01-13 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 12. |
2023-01-12 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 42359 | New Code | See Bill Text |