CA AB2337 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 355, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 355, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 230.1 of the Labor Code, relating to employment.
Title
Employment protections: victims of domestic violence, sexual assault, or stalking.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-22 - Assembly - AB 2337 BURKE Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-08-15 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2337 Burke By Jackson (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-08 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-19 - Assembly - AB 2337 BURKE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-15 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2337 Burke By Jackson (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-08 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-19 - Assembly - AB 2337 BURKE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-14 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 355, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-14 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-08-26 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2016-08-22 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6059.). |
2016-08-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-08-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4971.). |
2016-08-08 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-04 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-01 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2016-06-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-09 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-06-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 3. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on L. & I.R. and JUD. |
2016-05-19 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-05-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4859.) |
2016-05-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 4). |
2016-04-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-20 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2016-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 19). |
2016-04-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2016-03-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and JUD. |
2016-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2016-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 230.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |