CA AB2325 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-08-01 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Sections 4007.5 and 4007.6 of the Family Code, relating to child support.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child support: suspension.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Assembly - AB 2325 Carrillo Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 9 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-01SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-07-31SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 30).
2020-07-01SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2020-06-11SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2020-06-11AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 9.)
2020-06-03AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-06-02AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (June 2).
2020-05-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (May 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-05-05AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2020-05-04AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
2020-03-16AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2020-02-24AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2020-02-15AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
2020-02-14AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Family Code4007.5Repealed CodeCitation Text
Family Code4007.6Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback