CA AB2320 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-29 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-29 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 273.6, 402, 646.9, and 4573.5 of, and to add Section 290.97 to, the Penal Code, relating to unmanned aircraft systems.
Title
Unmanned aircraft systems.
Sponsors
Asm. Ian Calderon [D] | Asm. Evan Low [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-24 - Assembly - AB 2320 CALDERON Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-18 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2320 Calderon By Hancock (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-19 - Assembly - AB 2320 CALDERON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-08-18 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2320 Calderon By Hancock (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-19 - Assembly - AB 2320 CALDERON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-29 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2016-08-31 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2016-08-24 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6194.). |
2016-08-19 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-08-18 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5119.). |
2016-08-15 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2016-08-01 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-06-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-05-19 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-05-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4862.) |
2016-05-12 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (May 11). |
2016-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-05-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2016-04-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2016-04-21 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 20). |
2016-04-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2016-04-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2016-04-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2016-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P. & C.P. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. |
2016-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2016-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 273.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 290.97 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 402 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 4573.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 646.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 21401.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |