CA AB2316 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 237, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 237, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 5370.2 of, and to add Section 5524 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to mental health advocacy.
Title
Mental health: county patients’ rights advocates: training materials.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-13 - Assembly - AB 2316 EGGMAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2316 Eggman By Nguyen (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - AB 2316 EGGMAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2316 Eggman By Nguyen (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - AB 2316 EGGMAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 237, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-08-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2018-08-13 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6242.). |
2018-08-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-08-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5233.). |
2018-07-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-07-02 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-13 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 13). |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2018-05-10 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5120.) |
2018-05-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 2). |
2018-04-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-05 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-04 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 3). |
2018-03-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2018-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2018-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5370.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5524 | New Code | See Bill Text |