CA AB2312 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Sections 17059.4 and 23690 to the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Taxation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Revenue and Taxation] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-25AssemblyIn committee: Held under submission.
2018-05-25AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5298.)
2018-05-23AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-05-16AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-15AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
2018-05-15AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (May 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-01AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2018-04-30AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2018-04-26AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 17).
2018-03-21AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E.
2018-03-20AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J., E.D., & E. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-19AssemblyReferred to Coms. on J., E.D., & E. and REV. & TAX.
2018-02-14AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
2018-02-13AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Revenue and Taxation Code17059.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code17059.4New CodeSee Bill Text
Revenue and Taxation Code23689Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code23690New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback