CA AB2310 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 2031 and 2032 of the Streets and Highways Code, relating to transportation, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Road Maintenance and Rehabilitation Account: apportionment of funds: accrued interest.
Sponsors
Asm. Tom Daly [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2020-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2020-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Streets and Highways Code | 2031 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 2032 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2310 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2310 |