CA AB2308 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 23 2016 - 75% progression
Action: 2016-08-23 - Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend and repeal Section 49452.9 of, and to add and repeal Chapter 11.2 (commencing with Section 66920) of Part 40 of Division 5 of Title 3 of, the Education Code, relating to health care coverage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health care coverage: information to students.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-08-23 - AB 2308 HERNANDEZ Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 55 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-17 - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2308 Roger Hern (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-22 - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - AB 2308 HERNANDEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Education (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-08-23AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling.
2016-08-17AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 19 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2016-08-17SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 9.).
2016-08-15SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2016-08-11SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11).
2016-08-01SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2016-06-28SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2016-06-27SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 22).
2016-06-09SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2016-06-06SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2016-06-02AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 24. Page 5189.)
2016-06-01AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2016-05-31AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2016-05-27AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 6.) (May 27).
2016-05-11AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2016-04-27AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2016-04-26AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2016-04-25AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 20).
2016-04-14AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on ED.
2016-04-13AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 10. Noes 2.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on ED. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
2016-03-03AssemblyReferred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2016-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
2016-02-18AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code49452.9Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code66920New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_2308&sess=1516&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_2301-2350/ab_2308_bill_20160218_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_2301-2350/ab_2308_bill_20160413_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_2301-2350/ab_2308_bill_20160426_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_2301-2350/ab_2308_bill_20160531_amended_asm_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_2301-2350/ab_2308_bill_20160628_amended_sen_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_2301-2350/ab_2308_bill_20160825_enrolled.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_2301-2350/ab_2308_vote_20160412_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_2301-2350/ab_2308_vote_20160420_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_2301-2350/ab_2308_vote_20160527_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_2301-2350/ab_2308_vote_20160602_1241PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_2301-2350/ab_2308_vote_20160622_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_2301-2350/ab_2308_vote_20160801_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_2301-2350/ab_2308_vote_20160811_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_2301-2350/ab_2308_vote_20160817_1246PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_2301-2350/ab_2308_vote_20160823_0217PM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback