CA AB2307 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 185020 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to high-speed rail.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

High-Speed Rail Authority: Senate confirmation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-21 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB2307 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Assembly - AB 2307 FRAZIER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-01 Vetoed by Governor.
2018-05-24AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2018-05-21AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-05-21SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4221.).
2018-05-16SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-05-15SenateFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 15).
2018-05-03SenateReferred to Com. on T. & H.
2018-04-23SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-04-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4828.)
2018-04-18AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-04-17AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 16).
2018-03-19AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2018-03-15AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-15AssemblyReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2018-02-14AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
2018-02-13AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Utilities Code185020Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code185035Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback