CA AB2303 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-24 - Re-referred to Com. on ED. pursuant to Assembly Rule 97.
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-24 - Re-referred to Com. on ED. pursuant to Assembly Rule 97.
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 44415.5 to the Education Code, relating to education finance, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Education finance: instructional materials and teacher recruitment: computer science.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-24 - Assembly - AB 2303 THURMOND Third Reading Urgency Amend By THURMOND Set #1 (Y: 47 N: 24 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-24 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. pursuant to Assembly Rule 97. |
2018-08-24 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 47. Noes 24. Page 6542.) |
2018-08-21 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-21 | Assembly | From inactive file. |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Thurmond. |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Thurmond. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 25). |
2018-05-02 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-03-19 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-03-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2018-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2018-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 44415.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 53001 | New Code | See Bill Text |