CA AB2300 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on August 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 236, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 4846.5 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Continuing education: veterinarians.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-13 - Assembly - AB 2300 MAIENSCHEIN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2300 Maienschein et al. By Hill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - Assembly - AB 2300 MAIENSCHEIN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-28 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 236, Statutes of 2018.
2018-08-28 Approved by the Governor.
2018-08-16AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2018-08-13AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6245.).
2018-08-09AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-08-09SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 5235.).
2018-07-03SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-07-02SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-06-27SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-19SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-03SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2018-04-19SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-04-19AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 4790.)
2018-04-12AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-04-11AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 11).
2018-04-03AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-02AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2018-03-22AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (March 20).
2018-03-01AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2018-02-14AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
2018-02-13AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code4846.5Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback