CA AB2296 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 389, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 2908, 2995, 4507, 4999.32, 4999.33, 4999.62, and 4999.63 of the Business and Professions Code, to amend Section 56.105 of the Civil Code, to amend Section 35160.5 of the Education Code, to amend Section 1010 of the Evidence Code, to amend Sections 3110.5, 7663, 7827, 7850, 7851, 8502, and 9001 of the Family Code, to amend Section 3209.8 of the Labor Code, and to amend Sections 18951 and 18961.7 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to healing arts licensees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Licensed professional clinical counselors: licensed clinical social workers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-27 - Assembly - AB 2296 WALDRON Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2296 Waldron By Wilk (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Assembly - AB 2296 WALDRON Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-14 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 389, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-14 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-05AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2018-08-27AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6620.).
2018-08-22AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-08-21SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5515.).
2018-08-16SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-15SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-08-09SenateOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-09SenateFrom Consent Calendar.
2018-08-07SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-08-06SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-06-27SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-19SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-06-13SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2018-05-30SenateReferred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and JUD.
2018-05-17SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-17AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5215.)
2018-05-10AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-05-09AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 9).
2018-04-30AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-26AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2018-04-25AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 24).
2018-04-18AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-04-11AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2018-04-10AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
2018-04-02AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2018-03-23AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-22AssemblyReferred to Coms. on B. & P. and JUD.
2018-02-14AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
2018-02-13AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code201Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2908Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2995Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4507Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4999.32Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4999.33Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4999.62Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4999.63Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code56.105Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code35160.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Evidence Code1010Amended CodeCitation Text
Family Code3110.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Family Code7663Amended CodeCitation Text
Family Code7827Amended CodeCitation Text
Family Code7850Amended CodeCitation Text
Family Code7851Amended CodeCitation Text
Family Code8502Amended CodeCitation Text
Family Code9001Amended CodeCitation Text
Labor Code3209.8Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code18951Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code18961.7Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback