CA AB2295 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on June 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 37, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on June 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 37, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 186.11, 186.12, 1202.4, and 1202.46 of the Penal Code, relating to restitution.
Title
Restitution for crimes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-09 - Assembly - AB 2295 BAKER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-06-06 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2295 Baker By Glazer (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - Assembly - AB 2295 BAKER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-06 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2295 Baker By Glazer (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - Assembly - AB 2295 BAKER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 37, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-06-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:15 a.m. |
2016-06-09 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5304.). |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-06-06 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4176.). |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 10). |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-04-07 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-04-07 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4230.) |
2016-04-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-04-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 5). |
2016-03-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-03-15 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2016-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1202.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1202.46 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 186.11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 186.12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |