CA AB2293 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-25 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-25 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act relating to housing, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Housing: construction loans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-08-26 - Assembly - AB 2293 TORRES Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2293 Torres Urgency Clause (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-09 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-02 - Assembly - AB 2293 TORRES Third Reading Urgency (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2293 Torres Urgency Clause (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-09 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-02 - Assembly - AB 2293 TORRES Third Reading Urgency (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-25 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2010-09-08 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2010-08-26 | Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6711.) | |
2010-08-25 | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6644.) | |
2010-08-24 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2010-08-24 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4826.) | |
2010-08-17 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2010-08-16 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 12). | |
2010-08-09 | In committee: Placed on APPR suspense file. | |
2010-08-02 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2010-06-30 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 29). | |
2010-06-22 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | |
2010-06-10 | Referred to Com. on T. & H. | |
2010-06-03 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2010-06-02 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5479.) | |
2010-06-01 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-05-28 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | |
2010-05-19 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2010-04-21 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-04-20 | Read second time and amended. | |
2010-04-19 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 14). | |
2010-04-06 | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. | |
2010-04-05 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-03-11 | Referred to Com. on H. & C.D. | |
2010-02-21 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | |
2010-02-18 | Read first time. To print. |