CA AB2291 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 56836.06, 56836.11, and 56836.145 of, and to add Sections 56836.12 and 56836.146 to, the Education Code, relating to special education funding.
Title
Special education funding.
Sponsors
Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D] | Asm. Jose Medina [D] | Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D] | Asm. Vince Fong [R] |
Asm. Chad Mayes [I] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2020-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2020-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 56836.06 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 56836.11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 56836.12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 56836.145 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 56836.146 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2291 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2291 |