CA AB229 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 697, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 7583.2, 7583.3, 7587.8, and 7587.9 of, and to amend, repeal, and add Sections 7542, 7574.18, 7583.5, 7583.6, 7583.7, 7583.10, 7585, 7585.6, 7587.1, 7596, 7596.3, 7598.1, 7598.2, 7598.3, 7599.37, and 7599.38 of, the Business and Professions Code, relating to professions and vocations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Private investigators, proprietary security services, private security services, and alarm companies: training: use of force.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-08 - Assembly - AB 229 Holden Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-07 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB229 Holden et al. By Roth (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-23 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Assembly - AB 229 Holden Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-08 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 697, Statutes of 2021.
2021-10-08 Approved by the Governor.
2021-09-15 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
2021-09-08AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0.).
2021-09-08AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 42. Noes 13.)
2021-09-07AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 9 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2021-09-07SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0.).
2021-09-03SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-09-02SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2021-08-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-08-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 26).
2021-08-23SenateIn committee: Referred to suspense file.
2021-08-16SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-07-15SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-07-14SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 13).
2021-06-30SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2021-06-07SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2021-05-27SenateReferred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and PUB. S.
2021-05-18SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-05-17AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2021-05-06AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-05AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 5).
2021-05-05AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2021-04-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-03-03AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2021-03-02AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
2021-01-28AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2021-01-13AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 12.
2021-01-12AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code7542New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code7574.18New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code7583.10New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code7583.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7583.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7583.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code7583.6New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code7583.7New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code7585New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code7585.6New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code7587.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code7587.8Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7587.9Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7596New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code7596.3New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code7598.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code7598.2New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code7598.3New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code7599.37New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code7599.38New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback