CA AB2279 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 21168.15 to the Public Resources Code, relating to environmental quality.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Environmental quality: judicial review: housing projects.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-23AssemblyIn committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-04-09AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-03-19AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2018-03-15AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-15AssemblyReferred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and H. & C.D.
2018-02-14AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
2018-02-13AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Resources Code21168.15New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Resources Code501Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback