CA AB2276 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-29 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Allen.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-29 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Allen.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 758 of, and to add Sections 758.1 and 758.2 to, the Insurance Code, relating to insurance.
Title
Motor vehicle insurance: auto body repair.
Sponsors
Asm. Autumn Burke [D] | Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R] | Asm. Phillip Chen [R] | Asm. Kansen Chu [D] |
Asm. Tom Daly [D] | Asm. Tim Grayson [D] | Asm. Chad Mayes [I] | Asm. Randy Voepel [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - AB 2276 BURKE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - AB 2276 BURKE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-29 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Allen. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 16). |
2018-08-06 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-07-03 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-07-02 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (June 27). |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2018-06-04 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5637.) |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 25). |
2018-05-16 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-04-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-03-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2018-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2018-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Insurance Code | 758 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 758.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 758.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |