CA AB2275 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-07-31 - Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 15301.3 of the Government Code, relating to homelessness, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State armories: homeless shelters: security.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-29 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Assembly - AB 2275 Nazarian Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-31SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2020-07-30SenateFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 29).
2020-07-14SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2020-06-23SenateReferred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2020-05-27SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2020-05-26AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0.)
2020-05-13AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2020-05-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 12).
2020-05-12AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2020-04-24AssemblyReferred to Com. on L. GOV.
2020-02-15AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
2020-02-14AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code15301.3Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback