CA AB2274 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 16 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-08-16 - In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 2605 to the Family Code, relating to division of community property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Division of community property: pet animals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-16 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2274 Quirk By Jackson (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Assembly - AB 2274 QUIRK Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 4 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-16AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-08-16SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-06-21SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-06-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 19).
2018-05-30SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2018-05-17SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-17AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 4. Page 5203.)
2018-05-10AssemblyRead third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 5094.)
2018-04-09AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-04-05AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2018-04-04AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (April 3).
2018-04-03AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-04-02AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-01AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2018-02-14AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
2018-02-13AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Family Code2605New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback