CA AB2273 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 31 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-09-15 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 2111, 2113, 2168, 2168.1, and 2168.2, of, and to add Section 2168.5 to, the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Physicians and surgeons: foreign medical graduates: special faculty permits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-31 - Assembly - AB 2273 Bloom Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2273 Bloom et al. By Allen (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Assembly - AB 2273 Bloom Assembly Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-15AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2020-08-31AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0.).
2020-08-30AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2020-08-30SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.).
2020-08-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-08-25SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2020-08-20SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-08-19SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2020-08-14SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2020-08-11SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-08-10SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 8).
2020-08-06SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2020-07-01SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2020-06-16SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2020-06-15AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0.)
2020-06-04AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-06-03AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2020-06-02AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 2).
2020-05-22AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (May 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-05-19AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2020-05-18AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
2020-03-02AssemblyReferred to Coms. on B. & P. and HEALTH.
2020-02-15AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
2020-02-14AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback