CA AB2271 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 460, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 460, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 130232 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to transportation.
Title
Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority: contracting: local businesses.
Sponsors
Asm. Mike Gipson [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2271 Gipson By Hertzberg (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - AB 2271 Gipson Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - AB 2271 Gipson Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-22 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 460, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-22 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-06 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2022-08-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5120.). |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 28). |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 4879.) |
2022-05-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2022-05-04 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 4). |
2022-04-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2022-04-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2022-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2022-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 130232 | Amended Code | Citation Text |