CA AB2271 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Referred to Com. on JUD.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Referred to Com. on JUD.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 68651 of, and to add Section 68652 to, the Government Code, relating to courts.
Title
Appointed legal counsel in civil matters: unlawful detainer cases.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-08 - Assembly - AB 2271 Gabriel Assembly Second Reading (Y: 65 N: 6 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 6. Page 4713.) |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 59. Noes 17. Page 4700.) |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-04 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2020-06-03 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 3.) (June 3). |
2020-06-02 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-05-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (May 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-05-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2020-03-17 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2020-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 68651 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 68652 | New Code | See Bill Text |