CA AB2267 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-31 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Monning.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-31 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Monning.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 65457.1 of the Government Code, and to add and repeal Section 21168.6.9 of, and to add and repeal Chapter 6.8 (commencing with Section 21189.60) of Division 13 of, the Public Resources Code, relating to environmental quality.
Title
California Environmental Quality Act: Sonoma County Renewal Enterprise District.
Sponsors
Asm. Jim Wood [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - AB 2267 WOOD Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - AB 2267 WOOD Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-31 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Monning. |
2018-08-22 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-21 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16). |
2018-08-13 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-07-05 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-06-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-06-11 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ. |
2018-06-06 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ. |
2018-05-31 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on EQ. |
2018-05-10 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5130.) |
2018-05-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-05-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 2). |
2018-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2018-04-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-02 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2018-03-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2018-03-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-03-05 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2018-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65457 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65457.1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65458 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 800 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21080 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21080.27 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 21168.6.9 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21189.60 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |