CA AB2265 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Article 8 (commencing with Section 51480) of Chapter 3 of Part 28 of Division 4 of Title 2 of the Education Code, relating to high school diplomas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

High school diplomas: State Seal of STEM.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-16AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-05-02AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-01AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2018-04-30AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 25).
2018-04-18AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on ED.
2018-04-17AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-01AssemblyReferred to Com. on ED.
2018-02-14AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
2018-02-13AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code51480Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback