CA AB2263 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-22 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-22 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 15.9 (commencing with Section 18996.9) to Part 6 of Division 9 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public social services.
Title
The California Guaranteed Income Statewide Feasibility Study Act.
Sponsors
Asm. Laura Friedman [D] | Asm. Alex Lee [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-08-31 - Assembly - AB 2263 Friedman Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 51 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2024-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2263 Friedman et al. By Wiener (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-08-15 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-05 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-07-01 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-23 - Assembly - AB 2263 Friedman Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2263 Friedman et al. By Wiener (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-08-15 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-05 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-07-01 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-23 - Assembly - AB 2263 Friedman Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-22 | Assembly | Vetoed by Governor. |
2024-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2024-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 51. Noes 12.). |
2024-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2024-08-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 9.). |
2024-08-28 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-27 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2024-08-27 | Senate | Joint Rule 61 suspended. (Ayes 30. Noes 9.) |
2024-08-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 15). |
2024-08-05 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file. |
2024-07-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-11 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2024-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2024-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 14. Page 5627.) |
2024-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (May 16). |
2024-05-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2024-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2024-04-16 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2024-02-09 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 10. |
2024-02-08 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 18996.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |