CA AB2260 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-09 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-09 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 42008.9 to the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Vehicles: violations: payment of fines and bail.
Sponsors
Asm. Philip Ting [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-03-01 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and PUB. S. |
2018-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2018-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 42008.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB2260 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB2260 |