CA AB226 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on October 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 639, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on October 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 639, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 2.9 (commencing with Section 92618) to Chapter 6 of Part 57 of Division 9 of Title 3 of the Education Code, and to amend Section 8028 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to the University of California.
Title
University of California: California Native American Graves Protection and Repatriation Act of 2001.
Sponsors
Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D] | Asm. James Ramos [D] | Asm. Dawn Addis [D] | Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D] |
Asm. Mike Fong [D] | Asm. Liz Ortega [D] | Asm. Tri Ta [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-09-14 - Assembly - AB 226 Ramos Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-13 - Senate - Special Consent AB226 Ramos et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-26 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Assembly - AB 226 Ramos Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-13 - Senate - Special Consent AB226 Ramos et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-26 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Assembly - AB 226 Ramos Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-10 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 639, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-10-10 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-21 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2023-09-14 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 3544.). |
2023-09-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2023-09-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2764.). |
2023-09-08 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2023-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2023-09-01 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1). |
2023-06-26 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2023-06-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2023-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1707.) |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 18). |
2023-04-26 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2023-04-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-12 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2023-03-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2023-03-20 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. |
2023-01-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2023-01-12 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 11. |
2023-01-11 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 92618 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 8028 | Amended Code | Citation Text |