CA AB226 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1502 of, to add Chapter 7 (commencing with Section 1700) to Division 2 of, and to repeal Sections 1562.02 and 1562.03 of, the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Sections 11462.01 and 14021 of, and to repeal Section 11462.011 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to care facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Children’s crisis psychiatric residential treatment facilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-10 - Assembly - AB 226 Ramos Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB226 Ramos et al. By Portantino (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 226 Ramos Assembly Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-08AssemblyVetoed by Governor.
2021-09-15 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
2021-09-10AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0.).
2021-09-10AssemblyOrdered to the unfinished business file.
2021-09-10AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2021-09-10SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0.).
2021-09-07SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-09-03SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2021-08-30SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-08-26SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2021-08-26SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 26).
2021-08-16SenateIn committee: Referred to suspense file.
2021-07-12SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-07-08SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (July 6).
2021-06-30SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUMAN S. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
2021-06-23SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2021-06-09SenateReferred to Coms. on HEALTH and HUMAN S.
2021-06-02SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-06-01AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0.)
2021-05-24AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 20).
2021-05-12AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2021-04-22AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-14AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
2021-04-13AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
2021-03-03AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
2021-03-02AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
2021-01-28AssemblyReferred to Com. on HUM. S.
2021-01-12AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 11.
2021-01-11AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback