CA AB2259 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 383, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 383, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 52052.3 of the Education Code, relating to school accountability.
Title
School accountability: dropout recovery high schools.
Sponsors
Asm. Jose Medina [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2259 Medina By Liu (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-20 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-08 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Assembly - AB 2259 MEDINA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-20 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-08 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Assembly - AB 2259 MEDINA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-16 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 383, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-16 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-08-31 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2016-08-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2016-08-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5245.). |
2016-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2016-06-20 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-06-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2016-04-21 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-04-21 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 4463.) |
2016-04-14 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2016-04-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (April 13). |
2016-04-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-03-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2016-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2016-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 52052.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |