CA AB2251 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 186, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 186, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 4799.10.2 of the Public Resources Code, relating to urban forestry.
Title
Urban forestry: statewide strategic plan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-15 - Assembly - AB 2251 Calderon Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-08-08 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB2251 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2251 Calderon Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-08 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB2251 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2251 Calderon Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 186, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-08-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-18 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2022-08-15 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 5876.). |
2022-08-08 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 10 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2022-08-08 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4681.). |
2022-08-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2022-08-01 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2022-06-21 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-20 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 20). |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 4986.) |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (May 19). |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-04-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2022-04-07 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (April 4). |
2022-03-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2022-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2022-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2022-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 4799.10.2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |