CA AB225 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 18200 of the Penal Code, relating to gun violence restraining orders.
Title
Gun violence restraining orders: offenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-17 - Assembly - Reconsideration granted (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-03-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2016-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2016-01-12 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-03-17 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. In committee: Reconsideration granted. |
2015-02-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-02-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 6. |
2015-02-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 18200 | Amended Code | Citation Text |